This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:13:30 (UTC).

Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund et al v. WestRock RKT Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against WestRock RKT Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02852

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund

Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund

Defendant

WestRock RKT Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James D. Fagan, Jr.

Attorney at Stanford Fagan, LLC

2540 Lakewood Ave. Sw

Atlanta, GA 30315

Kathleen M. Keller

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser

805 Fifteenth Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Blair Schoenfeld

Attorney at Stanford Fagan, LLC

2540 Lakewood Ave. Sw

Atlanta, GA 30315

Elisabeth Mary Oppenheimer

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser

805 Fifteenth Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob M. Roth

Attorney at Jones Day-D.C.

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Miguel F. Eaton

Attorney at Jones Day-D.C.

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Jamila Marjani Hall

Attorney at Jones Day - Atlanta

1221 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 400

Atlanta, GA 30361

John Heron, IV

Attorney at Jones Day - Atlanta

1221 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 400

Atlanta, GA 30361

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Heron, IV on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (Heron, John) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila Marjani Hall on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (Hall, Jamila) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-CV-2852-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/9/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Amy Totenberg for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-02852-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/22/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund and Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11112282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) Attorney Miguel Eaton as to WestRock RKT Company regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Miguel F. Eaton. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/7/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Jacob Roth as to WestRock RKT Company regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jacob M. Roth. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/7/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Miguel F. Eaton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11232509).. Attorney Miguel F. Eaton added appearing on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (nmb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob M. Roth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11232389).. Attorney Jacob M. Roth added appearing on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (nmb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Miguel F. Eaton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11232509).by WestRock RKT Company. (Heron, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob M. Roth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11232389).by WestRock RKT Company. (Heron, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Heron, IV on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (Heron, John) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila Marjani Hall on behalf of WestRock RKT Company (Hall, Jamila) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-CV-2852-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/9/21. (rlb) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #3 and #4 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/4/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen Keller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11149847).. Attorney Kathleen M. Keller added appearing on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund (nmb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Elisabeth Oppenheimer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11149828).. Attorney Elisabeth Oppenheimer added appearing on behalf of Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund (nmb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Kathleen Keller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11149847).by Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Schoenfeld, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Elisabeth Oppenheimer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11149828).by Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund, Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Schoenfeld, Michael) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Amy Totenberg for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-02852-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 7/22/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund and Board of Trustees of the Pace Industry Union-Management Pension Fund. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11112282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westrock RKT Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PACE INDUSTRY UNION-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant