Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:12:00 (UTC).

PACCAR Financial Corp.v. Run-Rite Industries, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 PACCAR Financial Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Run-Rite Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marco A. Hernandez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marco A. Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACCAR Financial Corp.

PACCAR Financial Corp. a Washington corporation doing business as PACCAR Leasing Company

Defendants

Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America

Run-Rite Industries, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara C. Cotton

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Jessica Schuh

Attorney at Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt

1211 Sw 5Th Ave, Ste. 1600

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Brooks MacInnes Foster

Attorney at Chenoweth Law Group, LLP

510 Sw Fifth Avenue, Fourth Floor

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#14

(#14) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#12

(#12) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#8

(#8) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America served on 7/29/2019 . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Run-Rite Industries, LLC served on 7/29/2019 . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Run-Rite Industries, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/25/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., dba PACCAR Leasing Company. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

1 #10

Proposed Summons to Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America

1 #9

Proposed Summons to Run-Rite Industries, LLC

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Default Letter

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Guarantee from Gutterman's

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Run-Rite VLSA

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Assignment and Partial Assumption

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 . Answer is due by 9/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Answer is due by 9/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER issued by Judge Marco A. Hernandez: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #8 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 8/26/2019 for all defendants. (gm) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Foster, Brooks) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America served on 7/29/2019 . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Run-Rite Industries, LLC served on 7/29/2019 . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Run-Rite Industries, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/25/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., dba PACCAR Leasing Company. (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5940017 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by PACCAR Financial Corp., dba PACCAR Leasing Company against Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America, Run-Rite Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rush Lease, #2 Exhibit 2 - PacLease Assignment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Run-Rite Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment and Partial Assumption, #5 Exhibit 5 - Run-Rite VLSA, #6 Exhibit 6 - Guarantee from Gutterman's, #7 Exhibit 7 - Default Letter, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons to Run-Rite Industries, LLC, #10 Proposed Summons to Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America). (Cotton, Sara) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gutterman's Supply Corporation of America is a litigant

Latest cases where PACCAR FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks MacInnes Foster