This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2021 at 07:47:06 (UTC).

PACCAR Financial Corp. v. Jur Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2021 PACCAR Financial Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jur Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACCAR Financial Corp.

Defendants

Toby Kemp

Laura Randolph

Marlynden Holdings, Inc.

Denise Goodheart

Greg Goodheart

Jur Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Robert Prochaska

Attorney at Reno & Cavanaugh, PLLC

424 Church Street, Suite 2910

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorneys

E. Steele Clayton, IV

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims (Nashville Office)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Sara K. Morgan

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims (Nashville Office)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara K. Morgan on behalf of All Defendants (Morgan, Sara) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#19

(#19) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Prochaska, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Denise Goodheart, Greg Goodheart, Jur Corporation, Toby Kemp, Marlynden Holdings, Inc., Laura Randolph.(Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#17

(#17) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2021. Discovery due by 11/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2022. Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/25/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/18/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#16

(#16) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toby Kemp. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#15

(#15) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Laura Randolph. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#14

(#14) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greg Goodheart. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#13

(#13) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Denise Goodheart. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#10

NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Denise Goodheart, Greg Goodheart, Jur Corporation, Toby Kemp, Marlynden Holdings, Inc., Laura Randolph.(Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Sara K. Morgan admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara K. Morgan on behalf of All Defendants (Morgan, Sara) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PACCAR Financial Corp.. (Prochaska, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Denise Goodheart, Greg Goodheart, Jur Corporation, Toby Kemp, Marlynden Holdings, Inc., Laura Randolph.(Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2021. Discovery due by 11/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2022. Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 8/25/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/18/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toby Kemp. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Laura Randolph. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greg Goodheart. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Denise Goodheart. (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 5/17/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Call In Information: All parties dial 1-877-402-9753 access code 3808663#. (kc) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by E. Steele Clayton, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Clayton, E.) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/31/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Denise Goodheart, Greg Goodheart, Jur Corporation, Toby Kemp, Marlynden Holdings, Inc., and Laura Randolph. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 5/17/2021 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph Robert Prochaska admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Denise Goodheart, Greg Goodheart, Jur Corporation, Toby Kemp, Marlynden Holdings, Inc., and Laura Randolph (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503340984), filed by PACCAR Financial Corp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(kc) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACCAR FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robert Prochaska