This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

T.P. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2021 T P filed an Other lawsuit against Wyndham Hotels Resorts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers, Sarah D. Morrison, Kimberly A. Jolson and Algenon L. Marbley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04933

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Kimberly A. Jolson

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Algenon L. Marbley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T. P.

T.P.

Defendants

WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC

Red Roof Inns, Inc.

Best Western International, Inc.

American Hotel and Lodging Association

Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association

Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Charles Babin, Jr.

Attorney at Babin Law, LLC

22 East Gay Street, Ste 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory M. Zarzaur

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emanuella J. Paulos

Attorney at Levin Law Firm

316 South Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Christopher V Tisi

Attorney at Ashcraft & Gerel

2000 L Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Denise Wiginton

Attorney at The Zarzaur Law Firm

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jennifer Jana El-Kadi

Attorney at Babin Law, LLC

22 E. Gay Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Kathryn L. Avila

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A

316 S. Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Kelsie Overton

Attorney at The Zarzaur Law Firm

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Kimberly Lambert Adams

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, PA

316 S Baylen St - Ste 600, Po Box 12308

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Lynn Kennedy

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 2000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Bradley J Barmen

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

1375 East 9Th Street, Suite 2250

Cleveland, OH 44114

Bradley Scott Fyffe

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 2000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Judd R Uhl

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 2000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

D Patrick Kasson

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA

200 South Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

Steven A. Chang

Attorney at Reminger, Co., LPA

8Th Floor, 200 Civic Center Dr.

Columbus, OH 43215

Thomas N. Spyker

Attorney at REMINGER CO., LPA

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 800

Columbus, OH 43215

Ali I. Haque

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

Michael R Reed

Attorney at Hahn Loeser + Parks LLP

65 E. State Street, Suite 1400

Columbus, OH 43215

Elise Kraft Yarnell

Attorney at Hahn Loeser & Parks

65 E. State St., Suite 1400

Columbus, OH 43081

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Wyndham, Best Western, and OHLAs Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until APRIL 28, 2022 to file responses in opposition to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss, and Defendants shall have until MAY 26, 2022 to file reply briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 21, 2022. (jlk) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

46 #46

Main Document

40 #4

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

40 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

40 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

40 #1

Exhibit Exhibt A

40 #40

Main Document

#38

(#43) ORDER granting re #42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 4/21/2022. Replies due by 5/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 21, 2022. (jlk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#36

(#43) ORDER granting re #42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 4/21/2022. Replies due by 5/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 21, 2022. (jlk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

2 #3

Summons Form American Hotel & Lodging Association

2 #2

Summons Form Best Western International

1 #6

Summons Form

1 #5

Summons Form

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 4/28/2022 and Replies due by 5/26/2022. (jlk) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Wyndham, Best Western, and OHLAs Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until APRIL 28, 2022 to file responses in opposition to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss, and Defendants shall have until MAY 26, 2022 to file reply briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 21, 2022. (jlk) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Second MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/28/2022. by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff T.P.. (El-Kadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2022 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting re #42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 4/21/2022. Replies due by 5/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 21, 2022. (jlk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 4/21/2022. by Plaintiff T.P.. (El-Kadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Best Western International, Inc.. (Uhl, Judd) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Best Western International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Uhl, Judd) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association. (Haque, Ali) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Documents: #6 , #8 , #9 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Zarzaur, Kimberly Adams & Christopher Tisi filed by A. R. Deficiency Deadline by 11/29/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #5 & #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emanuella Paulos and Kathryn Avila. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/12/2021. (er) (Entered: 11/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Christopher V. Tisi by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Kimberly Adams by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Kathryn L. Avila by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Gregory Zarzaur by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8579004) of Emmie J. Paulos by Plaintiff T.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Babin, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-849 and 2:19-cv-5384 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2021. (kk2) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to American Hotel and Lodging Association, Best Western International Inc., Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association, Red Roof Inns Inc., and Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Red Roof Inns, #2 Summons Form Best Western International, #3 Summons Form American Hotel & Lodging Association, #4 Summons Form Ohio Hotel & Lodging Association) (kk2) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8524902), filed by T.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Babin, Steven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/8/2021) (jlk). (Entered: 10/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Hotel and Lodging Association is a litigant

Latest cases where American Hotel and Lodging Association is a litigant

Latest cases where T.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where RED ROOF INNS INC is a litigant