This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 09:27:02 (UTC).

P. v. Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 P filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah A. L. Merriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00850

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah A. L. Merriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C. P.

Defendants

Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company

United Behavioral Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew N. Goldfarb

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP-DC

1800 M Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Elizabeth K. Acee

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

545 Long Wharf Drive, 9Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06511

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2022 Discovery due by 1/6/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Behavioral Health, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth K. Acee* *Barclay Damon, LLP* *545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by C. P., #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew N. Goldfarb to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7046795) by C. P.. (Acee, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Goldfarb on behalf of C. P. (Goldfarb, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Goldfarb on behalf of C. P. (Goldfarb, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Attorney Andrew N. Goldfarb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2022. (Corriette, M.) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew N. Goldfarb to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7046795) by C. P.. (Acee, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORDER, All counsel and self-represented parties are advised that any requests for relief, including the rescheduling of conferences or hearings that have been calendared on ECF, must be made by filing of a motion on the docket, in full compliance with all applicable Federal and Local Rules. Relief from deadlines, orders, and calendars may not be obtained by calling or emailing chambers staff or the Clerk's Office. Court staff cannot provide advice or guidance, and ex parte communications with the Court are generally improper. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/7/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by C. P., #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Behavioral Health, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth K. Acee* *Barclay Damon, LLP* *545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2022 Discovery due by 1/6/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2022. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketJudge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Acee, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6989665.), filed by CP. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Acee, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth K. Acee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew N. Goldfarb