Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 07:13:37 (UTC).

P. v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 P filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05928

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E. P.

Defendant

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGG L. ZEFF

Attorney at ZEFF LAW FIRM LLC

100 Century Parkway Suite 160

Mt Laurel, NJ 08054

EVA ZELSON

Attorney at ZEFF LAW FIRM

100 Century Parkway. Suite 305

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

Defendant Attorneys

EILEEN KEEFE

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Ste. 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN M. NOLAN, III

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP

Three Parkway Suite 1350, 1601 Cherry St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/22/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN KEEFE on behalf of TEMPLE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Servive(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants time to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 4, 2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/4/20. 12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG L. ZEFF on behalf of E. P. (ZEFF, GREGG) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of TEMPLE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14739033), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/25/2020) (lvj, ). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/22/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN KEEFE on behalf of TEMPLE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Servive(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants time to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 4, 2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/4/20. 12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG L. ZEFF on behalf of E. P. (ZEFF, GREGG) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of TEMPLE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14739033), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/25/2020) (lvj, ). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eileen K Keefe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Nolan Esq.