This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 08:46:24 (UTC).

P. v. RSU, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 P filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RSU, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02604

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. P.

Defendants

RSU, INC. doing business as SUBWAY

SHARON URBANCZUK

LINDA GUNDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARRY A. WEISBERG

Defendant Attorney

JOHN M. NOLAN, III

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to LINDA GUNDERSON, RSU, INC. and SHARON URBANCZUK. Forwarded To: counsel on 7/5/22. (mbh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/8/22. 7/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of RSU, INC., SHARON URBANCZUK with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. P.. RSU, INC. waiver sent on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. P.. SHARON URBANCZUK waiver sent on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. P. re: Kevin Coleman Sr. served Summons and Complaint upon LINDA GUNDERSON by Hand Delivered to Usual Place of Business. LINDA GUNDERSON served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. P. re: Kevin Coleman Sr. served Summons and Complaint upon LINDA GUNDERSON by Hand Delivered to Usual Place of Business. LINDA GUNDERSON served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. P.. SHARON URBANCZUK waiver sent on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. P.. RSU, INC. waiver sent on 7/13/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of RSU, INC., SHARON URBANCZUK with Certificate of Service(NOLAN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/8/22. 7/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to LINDA GUNDERSON, RSU, INC. and SHARON URBANCZUK. Forwarded To: counsel on 7/5/22. (mbh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16023024.), filed by J. P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less