This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 07:47:42 (UTC).

P. et al v. New York City Department of Education

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 P filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesse M. Furman and Sarah Netburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04054

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

Referral Judge

Sarah Netburn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. P.

Defendant

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Elizabeth Murray

Attorney at Cuddy Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

5693 South Street Road

Auburn, NY 13021

Defendant Attorney

Martha Nimmer

Attorney at City of New York Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter, filed by R. P. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is due no later than September 16, 2021. Defendant's opposition is due on October 15, 2021. Plaintiffs reply is due on October 26, 2021. So Ordered (Motions due by 9/16/2021., Responses due by 10/15/2021, Replies due by 10/26/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/7/2021) (js) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#11

(#11) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs dated June 1, 2021 re: Initial Pretrial Matters and Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#8

(#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Martha Nimmer dated 05/24/21. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Nimmer on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER: In this case, Plaintiffs seek attorney's fees in connection with their claims under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, Title 20, United States Code, Section 1410 et seq. By separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring the matter to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. Unless and until the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise, the parties shall file a joint letter (addressed to the Magistrate Judge), no later than two weeks from the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. In addition, to conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge and further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/7/2021) (rro) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to file, no later than two weeks from the date on whichDefendant enters an appearance, a joint letter (addressed to Magistrate Judge Netburn) not to exceed two pages indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial pretrial conference in this case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/7/2021) (nb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(jgo) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24500982)Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter, filed by R. P. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is due no later than September 16, 2021. Defendant's opposition is due on October 15, 2021. Plaintiffs reply is due on October 26, 2021. So Ordered (Motions due by 9/16/2021., Responses due by 10/15/2021, Replies due by 10/26/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/7/2021) (js) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs dated June 1, 2021 re: Initial Pretrial Matters and Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Martha Nimmer dated 05/24/21. The Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than July 27, 2021, along with a status letter. The Court urges the parties to work together to resolve remaining scheduling disputes. In addition, this matter is referred to my docket for general pretrial supervision. Accordingly, any further requests for extensions should be directed to my Chambers. (New York City Department of Education answer due 7/27/2021.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Plaintiffs dated May 25, 2021 re: #8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Martha Nimmer dated 05/24/21. . Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability ). (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2).(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Martha Nimmer dated 05/24/21. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Nimmer on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nimmer, Martha) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: In this case, Plaintiffs seek attorney's fees in connection with their claims under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, Title 20, United States Code, Section 1410 et seq. By separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring the matter to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. Unless and until the Magistrate Judge orders otherwise, the parties shall file a joint letter (addressed to the Magistrate Judge), no later than two weeks from the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. In addition, to conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge and further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/7/2021) (rro) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to file, no later than two weeks from the date on whichDefendant enters an appearance, a joint letter (addressed to Magistrate Judge Netburn) not to exceed two pages indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial pretrial conference in this case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/7/2021) (nb) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(jgo) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24500982)Document filed by R. P.(individually), R. P.(on behalf of E.H.P., a child with a disability )..(Murray, Erin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant