Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:45:38 (UTC).

P C L Civil Constructors Inc v. Arch Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 P C L Civil Constructors Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arch Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00491

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

P C L Civil Constructors Inc

Defendant

Arch Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Norman A Mott, III

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek

5051 Westheimer Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77056

Adrian A D'Arcy

Attorney at Shields Mott

650 Poydras St Ste 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lloyd N Shields

Attorney at Shields Mott

650 Poydras St Ste 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Laura E Avery

Attorney at Shields Mott

650 Poydras St Ste 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Russel W Wray

Attorney at Wray & Assoc

P O Box 1848

St Francisville, LA 70775

Jacob Andrew Altmyer

Attorney at Wray & Assoc

P O Box 1848

St Francisville, LA 70775

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Arch Insurance Co.(aty,Wray, Russel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

9 #2

Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion

9 #1

Affidavit of Kelly K Commander

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss this suit on the basis of forum non conveniens by Arch Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelly K Commander, #2 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion)(aty,Wray, Russel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Arch Insurance Co answer due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/24/2019. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Arch Capital Group Ltd, Arch Reinsurance Co for Arch Insurance Co. (aty,Wray, Russel) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

6 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Answer by Arch Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Russel W Wray added to party Arch Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wray, Russel) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify event to more accurately reflect document and modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P C L Civil Constructors Inc identifying Corporate Parent P C L Construction Enterprises for P C L Civil Constructors Inc. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified on 4/23/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Adrian A D'Arcy on behalf of P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/1/2019. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Insurance Co. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #3

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3927352) filed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Adrian A D'Arcy added to party P C L Civil Constructors Inc (pty:pla))(aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified on 4/17/2019 to modify docket text (Whidden, C). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Arch Insurance Co.(aty,Wray, Russel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss this suit on the basis of forum non conveniens by Arch Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kelly K Commander, #2 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion)(aty,Wray, Russel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Arch Insurance Co answer due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/24/2019. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Arch Capital Group Ltd, Arch Reinsurance Co for Arch Insurance Co. (aty,Wray, Russel) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Answer by Arch Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Russel W Wray added to party Arch Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wray, Russel) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify event to more accurately reflect document and modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P C L Civil Constructors Inc identifying Corporate Parent P C L Construction Enterprises for P C L Civil Constructors Inc. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified on 4/23/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/22/2019. (crt,Stephens, M) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Adrian A D'Arcy on behalf of P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/1/2019. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Insurance Co. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3927352) filed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Adrian A D'Arcy added to party P C L Civil Constructors Inc (pty:pla))(aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified on 4/17/2019 to modify docket text (Whidden, C). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCL Civil Constructors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrian A. D'Arcy(Designation Retained)