Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 13:51:46 (UTC).

Ozmo Licensing LLC v. HP Inc.

Case Summary

On April 20, 2021, Ozmo Licensing LLC (“Ozmo Licensing” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Aaron S. Jacobs, James J. Foster, Robert R. Gilman of Prince Lobel Tye LLP and Derek T. Gilliland of Sorey, Gilliland & Hull, LLP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against HP Inc., (“HP” or “Defendants”) seeking royalty and other damages for the alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Courts in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff asserted that the PTO issued United States Patent No. 9,264,991 (“the ’991 patent”), titled “Apparatus and Method for Integrating Short Range Wireless Personal Area Networks for A Wireless local Area Network Infrastructure” and United States Patent No. 10,873,906 (“the ’906 patent”), titled “Apparatus and Method for Integrating Short Range Wireless Personal Area Networks for A Wireless Local Area Network Infrastructure”. Ozmo Licensing is the owner and assignee of all rights, title and interest in and to the ‘991 and ’906 patent (collectively, “the Ozmo Devices patents” or “the patents-in-suit”) and holds all substantial rights therein, including the right to grant licenses, to exclude others, and to enforce and recover past damages for infringement of the ’906 patent. 

 

In the complaint, Ozmo Licensing has alleged that “HP intentionally designed and incorporated the IEEE 802.11/Wi-Fi Direct features and functionalities into the Accused Products, and advertises its products as complying with those features and functionalities.” “By its instructions, , and with intent that they use the IEEE 802.11/Wi-Fi Direct features, HP has induced its customers to infringe the ’991 patent. HP’s customers who use the Accused Products as described above directly infringe the ’991 patent. HP has had knowledge of the ’991 patent since at least as early as March 23, 2020,. HP also induces such infringement by failing to remove the infringing features from the Accused Products.”

 

Ozmo Licensing further alleged that “HP has infringed, and continues to infringe, the ’906 patent by making, importing, using, offering for sale and selling in the United States numerous wireless devices, including laptop computers, desktop computers, printers and monitors that include Wi-Fi Direct functionality (together, “Accused Products”). The same Accused Products that infringe the ’991 patent infringe the ’906 patent, and vice versa.”

 

There are two counts for relief laid down by Ozmo Licensing. The first count for relief is for HP’s alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,264,991. HP allegedly continues to incorporate the infringing functionalities in the Accused Products, and has failed to compensate Ozmo Licensing for the use of such features. The second count for relief is for HP’s alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 10,873,906. With knowledge of the allegations set forth herein, HP nonetheless refuses to remove the infringing functionalities from the Accused Products or to compensate Ozmo Licensing for the use of such features.

 

In its prayer for relief, Ozmo Licensing has requested the Court to adjudge that HP has infringed one or more claims of each of the above patents-in-suit, directly and/or indirectly, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents; and thus, award damages to the Plaintiff along with royalty for future infringement, interests, costs and any other relief as the Court may deem just and proper. 

 

Disclaimer: This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ozmo Licensing LLC

Defendant

HP Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron S. Jacobs

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

James J. Foster

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Derek T. Gilliland

Attorney at Sorey, Gilliland & Hull, LLP

109 W. Tyler Street

Longview, TX 75601

Robert R. Gilman

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

303 Colorado Street, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. HP Inc. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#6

(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to HP Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/20/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14717098). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. HP Inc. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to HP Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (lad) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Gilliland, Derek) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/20/2021) (lad). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14717098). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ozmo Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gilliland, Derek) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HP, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek T. Gilliland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert R. Gilman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J. Foster