This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2022 at 09:13:16 (UTC).

Oyo Ita v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Oyo Ita filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02013

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Offiong Offiong Oyo Ita

Defendants

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

John M Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O Hacking, III

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendantsshall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 11/28/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/8/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendantsshall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 11/28/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/8/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John M Allen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by John M Allen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of John M Allen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John M Allen, served on 9/16/2022; Ur Mendoza Jaddou, served on 9/16/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, served on 9/16/2022; U.S. Attorney, served on 9/15/2022; U.S. Attorney General, served on 9/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) USPS RECEIPTS) (Hacking, James) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to John M Allen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mms) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Offiong Offiong Oyo Ita. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hacking, James) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten pdf on 9/12/2022) (mms). Modified on 9/12/2022 (mms). (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John M Allen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Offiong Offiong Oyo Ita. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13131270) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS USCIS, #3 SUMMONS USCIS DIRECTOR, #4 SUMMONS USCIS LOCAL, #5 SUMMONS ATT. GRAL., #6 SUMMONS US ATT.) (Hacking, James) (Attachments 2-6 replaced to flatten pdfs on 9/12/2022) (mms). Modified on 9/12/2022 (mms). (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less