This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 08:04:24 (UTC).

Oyadomari v. Pybus

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Oyadomari filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pybus. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Oyadomari

Mililani, HI 96789

Defendant

Sean Pybus

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/2/2020. As of March 2, 2020, Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee, has not filed an IFP application, and has not filed a request for an extension of time to pay the filing fee or file an IFP application. Thus, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari will be served by First Class Mail on March 2, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

4 #1

Consent Form

3 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/2/2020 pursuant to ECF #7 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari will be served by First Class Mail on March 2, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sean Pybus - filed by William Oyadomari (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 3/9/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) along with a copy of the filed-stamped Complaint. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/7/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs was included in the mailing to Mr. Oyadomari. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/2/2020 pursuant to ECF #7 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari will be served by First Class Mail on March 2, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/2/2020. As of March 2, 2020, Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee, has not filed an IFP application, and has not filed a request for an extension of time to pay the filing fee or file an IFP application. Thus, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari will be served by First Class Mail on March 2, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • (#6) NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00012 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - William Oyadomari shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 28, 2020. (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • (#5) EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as the Magistrate Judge on this case. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - William Oyadomari has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 3/9/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) along with a copy of the filed-stamped Complaint. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/7/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - William Oyadomari was served by First Class Mail on 1/9/2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs was included in the mailing to Mr. Oyadomari. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sean Pybus - filed by William Oyadomari (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.