This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2019 at 07:50:41 (UTC).

Owusu v. Feeley et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Owusu filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Feeley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00694

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Samuel Owusu

Defendants

William P. Barr

Thomas E. Feeley

Kevin K. McAleenan

Jeffery Searls

Respondents

Jeffrey Searls

William Barr

Kevin McAleenan

Thomas Feeley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Joseph David Moravec

Attorney at Prisoners' Legal Services of New York (Albany)

41 State Street, Suite M112

Albany, NY 12207

Respondent Attorneys

United States Attorney's Office (e-service)

Attorney at Western District of New York

Adam A. Khalil

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

100 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

9 #1

petition

#9

(#9) ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this order the respondents shall file and serve an answer and a memorandum of law. The respondents may within 30 days of this order file instead of their answer a motion to dismiss the petition. The petitioner shall have 15 days upon receipt of the respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a response. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 petition)(KM) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER. Oral Argument re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus set for 8/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/25/2019. (CMD) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, #11 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IJ Bond Memorandum, #2 Exhibit BIA Bond Decison)(Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls. (Khalil, Adam) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DO Oliveri Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to DO Oliveri Declaration, #3 Declaration of DO Hobart)(Khalil, Adam) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan, Jeffrey Searls (Khalil, Adam) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this order the respondents shall file and serve an answer and a memorandum of law. The respondents may within 30 days of this order file instead of their answer a motion to dismiss the petition. The petitioner shall have 15 days upon receipt of the respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a response. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 petition)(KM) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter filed . (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Jeffery Searls on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on James P. Kennedy on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Kevin K. McAleenan on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Thomas F. Feeley on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on William P. Barr on 05/29/2019, filed by Samuel Owusu. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3466793.), filed by Samuel Owusu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTA, #2 Exhibit Bond Order, #3 Exhibit Bond Appeal Notice, #4 Exhibit Bond Appeal Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Administrative Bond Denial)(Moravec, Joseph) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.