This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2021 at 10:29:51 (UTC).

Owners Insurance Company v. Janco 441 Condo Association, Inc

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Janco 441 Condo Association, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02239

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owners Insurance Company

Defendant

Janco 441 Condo Association, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Nathaniel S. Barker

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Janco 441 Condo Association, Inc waiver sent on 9/1/2021, answer due 10/31/2021. (Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Janco 441 Condominium Association, Inc. by Plaintiff Owners Insurance Company. (Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Janco 441 Condo Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8027787)Attorney Nathaniel S. Barker added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barker, Nathaniel) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel S. Barker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Bennett Stephenson