This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 10:44:53 (UTC).

Owners Insurance Company v. Alexander et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Owners Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Alexander. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04011

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owners Insurance Company

Defendants

TDJ Development, LLC

Rick Alexander d/b/a Alexander & Associates

Rick Alexander doing business as Alexander & Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Barzee

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Richard F. Lombardo

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Owners Insurance Company (Barzee, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Plaintiff Owners Insurance Company.(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 1/25/21 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Rick Alexander and TDJ Development, LLC. Summons returned to Plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Owners Insurance Co.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7249343. Service due by 4/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDER & ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Barzee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard F. Lombardo