This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 09:58:33 (UTC).

OWENS v. VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 OWENS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS

Defendant

VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at HASSLER KONDRAS MILLER LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Aaron J. Williamson

Attorney at WILLIAMSON CIVIL LAW, LLC

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert Peter Kondras, Jr withdrawn. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/10/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance by Robert P. Kondras, Jr., filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC served on 2/1/2021. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#3

(#3) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC, filed by CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6372696) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert Peter Kondras, Jr withdrawn. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/10/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance by Robert P. Kondras, Jr., filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC served on 2/1/2021. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VALUE SELF STORAGE LLC, filed by CHRISTOPHER C. OWENS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6372696) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron J Williamson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.