This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 13:36:31 (UTC).

Denene Carla Owens v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Denene Carla Owens filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00311

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denene Carla Owens

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Allen Amarkarian

Defendant Attorneys

Amir M Nassihi

Amy Patricia Maclear

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court, No. CIVSB2215918. (lc) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#13

(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER REMANDING CASE. The Court ordered Defendant Ford Motor Co. to show cause why the case should not be remanded for an amount in controversy insufficient to support diversity jurisdiction. Defendant filed a response indicating that Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens is seeking $105,696.36 in damages and penalties alone. Plaintiff file da motion to remand confirming she does not dispute the action places over $75,000 in controversy but requesting remand for defects in the removal procedure. Defendant opposes the motion to remand, and Plaintiff filed a reply. The Court deems both matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. Because the Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court does not reach Plaintiff s arguments that defects in the removal procedure require remand The Court remands the case to the San Bernardino County Superior Court, No. CIVSB2215918. The motion to remand is denied as moot #10 . The Court directs the Clerk to effect the remand immediately and close the case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 4/13/2023 (lc). (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#12

(#12) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF A MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens. (Amarkarian, Allen) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

11 #4

Exhibit 3

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Declaration of Amy Maclear

#11

(#11) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Maclear, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Maclear, Amy) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

10 #6

Exhibit 4

10 #5

Exhibit 3

10 #4

Exhibit 2

10 #3

Exhibit 1

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Declaration of Allen Amarkarian

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen Amarkarian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Amarkarian, Allen) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

9 #1

Declaration of Andrew Trask

#9

(#9) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #8 to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Trask, #2 Exhibit 1)(Trask, Andrew) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. The Complaint in this case alleges a violation of the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act. Defendant removed the action from state court, invoking diversity jurisdiction. The Court questions its jurisdiction over the action The Court orders Defendant to show cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Defendant shall file a written response within 14 days either acknowledging the Court lacks jurisdiction or establishing by a preponderance of evidence that the amount in controversy "more likely than not" exceeds $75,000.00. Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's response within seven days of its filing. (lc) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court, No. CIVSB2215918. (lc) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER REMANDING CASE. The Court ordered Defendant Ford Motor Co. to show cause why the case should not be remanded for an amount in controversy insufficient to support diversity jurisdiction. Defendant filed a response indicating that Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens is seeking $105,696.36 in damages and penalties alone. Plaintiff file da motion to remand confirming she does not dispute the action places over $75,000 in controversy but requesting remand for defects in the removal procedure. Defendant opposes the motion to remand, and Plaintiff filed a reply. The Court deems both matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. Because the Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court does not reach Plaintiff s arguments that defects in the removal procedure require remand The Court remands the case to the San Bernardino County Superior Court, No. CIVSB2215918. The motion to remand is denied as moot #10 . The Court directs the Clerk to effect the remand immediately and close the case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 4/13/2023 (lc). (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF A MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens. (Amarkarian, Allen) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Maclear, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Maclear, Amy) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen Amarkarian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Amarkarian, Allen) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #8 to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Trask, #2 Exhibit 1)(Trask, Andrew) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. The Complaint in this case alleges a violation of the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act. Defendant removed the action from state court, invoking diversity jurisdiction. The Court questions its jurisdiction over the action The Court orders Defendant to show cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Defendant shall file a written response within 14 days either acknowledging the Court lacks jurisdiction or establishing by a preponderance of evidence that the amount in controversy "more likely than not" exceeds $75,000.00. Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's response within seven days of its filing. (lc) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00311 MCS (SPx). (jtil) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Denene Carla Owens, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation, identifying State Street Corporation, Black Rock, Inc., The Vanguard Group. (Maclear, Amy) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation. (Maclear, Amy) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2215918 Receipt No: ACACDC-34850547 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less