This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:36:26 (UTC).

Owan et al v. Equinor Energy, LP

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Owan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Equinor Energy, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Owan

Phyllis Owan

Defendant

Equinor Energy, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas E. Kalil

Attorney at Kalil Law Firm, PLLC

111 E. Broadway, Po Box 1487

Williston, ND 58802-1487

Defendant Attorneys

Christina Ann Huckfeldt

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

1133 College Ave., Suite 1000

Bismarck, ND 58501

Lawrence Bender

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA (Bismarck)

1133 College Drive, Suite 1000

Bismarck, ND 58501

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 8/26/2020 to remove text-only language.(js) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/4/2021. Discovery Motions due by 6/4/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/2/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/17/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/12/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Threshold Motions due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2021. (BG) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct due date for joining additional parties. Regenerated NEF (cjs). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Phyllis Owan, William Owan. (cjs) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#11

(#11) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#10

(#10) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Equinor Energy, LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Email dated March 18, 2019

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Email dated February 7, 2019

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Email from Adam Landstrom

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Commencement of Drilling Operations

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Damage Settlement and Surface Use Agreement

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 8/26/2020 to remove text-only language.(js) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 12/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (4 days). (BG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Join Additional Parties due by 11/13/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/4/2021. Discovery Motions due by 6/4/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/2/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/17/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/12/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Threshold Motions due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2021. (BG) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct due date for joining additional parties. Regenerated NEF (cjs). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#13) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2020. (BG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Phyllis Owan, William Owan. (cjs) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Answer to Complaint. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #7 . (cjs) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by Equinor Energy, LP.(Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 7/9/2020 to restrict access(cjs). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Equinor Energy, LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Adam Landstrom) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Damage Settlement and Surface Use Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Commencement of Drilling Operations, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Adam Landstrom, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email dated February 7, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email dated March 18, 2019)(am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor Energy, LP from Williams County District Court, case number 53-2020-CV-00726. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000849 filed by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less