This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:03:52 (UTC).

Artak Ovsepian v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Artak Ovsepian filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07717

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Artak Ovsepian

Respondents

United States of America (DOJ)

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Benjamin L Coleman

Attorney at Coleman and Balogh LLP

1350 Columbia Street Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorneys

Benjamin R Barron

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

411 West 4Th Street, Suite 8000

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) REPLY in Support of Section 2255 Motion filed by Petitioner Artak Ovsepian. (Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A - H

#6

(#6) REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARTAK OVSEPIAN'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255; DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN R. BARRON; EXHIBITS filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(Barron, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING RETURN OF Section 2255 MOTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 : Based upon Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed herein and good cause appearing: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Attorney file a Return to the motion on or before 9/18/2020, accompanied by all records, and that Respondent serve a copy of the Return upon the Petitioner prior to the filing thereof. NO EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED EXCEPT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN UNDER EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Return, he shall do so twenty-one days from the Return filing date, setting forth separately: (a) his admission or denial of any new factual allegations of the Return, and (b) any additional legal arguments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any pleading or other paper submitted to be filed and considered by the Court does not include a certificate of service upon the Respondent, or counsel for Respondent, it will be stricken from this case and disregarded by the Court. (bm) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Benjamin R. Barron on behalf of Respondent United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR terminated. (Attorney Benjamin R Barron added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Barron, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (esa) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Artak Ovsepian. (Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Memorandum

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 2:11-CR-01075-SJO-6, filed by Petitioner Artak Ovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Benjamin L Coleman added to party Artak Ovsepian(pty:bkmov))(Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY in Support of Section 2255 Motion filed by Petitioner Artak Ovsepian. (Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARTAK OVSEPIAN'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255; DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN R. BARRON; EXHIBITS filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(Barron, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING RETURN OF Section 2255 MOTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 : Based upon Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed herein and good cause appearing: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Attorney file a Return to the motion on or before 9/18/2020, accompanied by all records, and that Respondent serve a copy of the Return upon the Petitioner prior to the filing thereof. NO EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED EXCEPT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN UNDER EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Return, he shall do so twenty-one days from the Return filing date, setting forth separately: (a) his admission or denial of any new factual allegations of the Return, and (b) any additional legal arguments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any pleading or other paper submitted to be filed and considered by the Court does not include a certificate of service upon the Respondent, or counsel for Respondent, it will be stricken from this case and disregarded by the Court. (bm) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Benjamin R. Barron on behalf of Respondent United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR terminated. (Attorney Benjamin R Barron added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Barron, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (esa) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Artak Ovsepian. (Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 2:11-CR-01075-SJO-6, filed by Petitioner Artak Ovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Benjamin L Coleman added to party Artak Ovsepian(pty:bkmov))(Coleman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less