This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:38:13 (UTC).

Ovono Eyuima v. Keeton

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Ovono Eyuima filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Keeton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine (PS) and John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02485

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah M Fine (PS)

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima

Eloy, AZ 85131

Respondent

Chuck Keeton

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima. (59 pages)(RMV) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Pages 56, 57, 58 rescanned) (SLQ). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

1 #1

Pages 56, 57, 58 rescanned

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/29/2019. (RMV) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima. (2 pages) (RMV) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX208247. (RMV) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/29/2019. (RMV) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (RMV) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Miguel Angel Ngui Ovono Eyuima. (59 pages)(RMV) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Pages 56, 57, 58 rescanned) (SLQ). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.