This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 07:10:32 (UTC).

Overton Chicago Gear Corporation v. NGC Transmission Equipment (America), Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Overton Chicago Gear Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NGC Transmission Equipment America , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03030

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Overton Chicago Gear Corporation

Defendant

NGC Transmission Equipment (America), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maxwell Anthony Kling

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, Llc

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654-4614

John Joseph Rock

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Cory D Anderson

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

#7

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant NGC Transmission Equipment (America), Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Overton Chicago Gear Corporation as to NGC Transmission Equipment (America), Inc.. (Rock, John) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant NGC Transmission Equipment (America), Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/6/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Overton Chicago Gear Corporation (Rock, John) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Overton Chicago Gear Corporation by Maxwell Anthony Kling (Kling, Maxwell) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Overton Chicago Gear Corporation by Cory D Anderson (Anderson, Cory) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Overton Chicago Gear Corporation by John Joseph Rock (Rock, John) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rock, John) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Overton Chicago Gear Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17034366. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Rock, John) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maxwell Anthony Kling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J. Rock