This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 14:36:19 (UTC).

OVERSTREET et al v. WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 OVERSTREET filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNNIE OVERSTREET

CHELSEA WELCH

Defendants

JOHN SUMNER

JOHN DOES

JEFF HOBBY

CORONER JOHN M JOHNSON

WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGUA BIANCA BENSON

3080 Campbellton Rd Sw

Atlanta, GA 30311

THOMAS F CUFFIE

3080 Campbellton Rd Sw

Atlanta, GA 30311

Defendant Attorneys

LOUIS E HATCHER

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702-2008

ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery and Delay Issuance of Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #10 Order - Rules 16/26 by JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

10 #1

Required Form

#10

(#10) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/31/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

8 #7

Exhibit G - Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

8 #3

Exhibit C - Renewal Complaint

8 #2

Exhibit B - Voluntary Dismissal

8 #1

Exhibit A - Original Complaint

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by JOHN DOES, JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Renewal Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Order Denying Motion to Recuse, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Dismissal, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Response to Defendants' First Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit G - Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

1 #9

Summons SUMMONS - JOHN SUMNER

1 #8

Summons SUMMONS - JOHN M. JOHNSON

1 #7

Summons SUMMONS - JEFF HOBBY

1 #6

Summons SUMMONS - WORTH COUNTY

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

1 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

1 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

1 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3472263, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Summons SUMMONS - WORTH COUNTY, #7 Summons SUMMONS - JEFF HOBBY, #8 Summons SUMMONS - JOHN M. JOHNSON, #9 Summons SUMMONS - JOHN SUMNER)(CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery and Delay Issuance of Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #10 Order - Rules 16/26 by JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : filed by JEFF HOBBY, JOHN DOES, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA (mdm) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter regarding EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/31/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN DOES, JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA with Jury Demand.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, : by JOHN DOES, JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER, WORTH COUNTY GEORGIA filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Renewal Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Order Denying Motion to Recuse, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Dismissal, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Response to Defendants' First Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit G - Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Coroner John M. Johnson by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET (CUFFIE, THOMAS) Modified on 6/24/2020 to revise docket text. (mdm) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Worth County Georgia by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET (CUFFIE, THOMAS) Modified on 6/24/2020 to revise docket text. (mdm) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 USM285 Process Receipt and Return filed by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET, #4 USM285 Process Receipt and Return filed by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET ); Wrong event used - Certificate of Service is correct event. No need to refile. (mdm) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) USM285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JOHN SUMNER. (CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) USM285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JEFF HOBBY. (CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to JOHN DOES, JEFF HOBBY, JOHN M JOHNSON, JOHN SUMNER. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(bcl) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOHNNIE OVERSTREET, CHELSEA WELCH (bcl) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET, CHELSEA WELCH ) - For future reference, documents must be filed to include a description of exhibit(s). Do not refile. (bcl) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JOHNNIE OVERSTREET, CHELSEA WELCH ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (bcl) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3472263, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Summons SUMMONS - WORTH COUNTY, #7 Summons SUMMONS - JEFF HOBBY, #8 Summons SUMMONS - JOHN M. JOHNSON, #9 Summons SUMMONS - JOHN SUMNER)(CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUIS E HATCHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD