This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:55:47 (UTC).

OVADYA v. TARGET CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 OVADYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-19472

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERI OVADYA

Defendants

TARGET CORPORATION

CLIFTON COMMONS I, LLC

RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LP

ABC CORP 1-10

JOHN DOE 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD LABARBIERA

Attorney at LABARBIERA & MARTINEZ

9252 Kennedy Boulevard

North Bergen, NJ 07047

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE

Attorney at FISHMAN MCINTYRE BERKELEY LEVINE SAMANSKY P.C.

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936-3158

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE terminated.. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Order Consent Order to Remand by BERI OVADYA. (LABARBIERA, RICHARD) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that this Consent Order to Remand is Granted and this case is Remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Hudson County, docket number HUD-L-3833-21. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/17/2021. (sm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-3833-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (sm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (sm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-3833-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (sm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that this Consent Order to Remand is Granted and this case is Remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Hudson County, docket number HUD-L-3833-21. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/17/2021. (sm) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: Incoming counsel for Defendant is directed to enter a notice of appearance containing full contact information. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/17/21. (tjg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Order Consent Order to Remand by BERI OVADYA. (LABARBIERA, RICHARD) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Substitution of Attorney - Attorney CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE terminated.. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TARGET CORPORATION from HUDSON COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number HUD-L-3833-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12941640), filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCINTYRE, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELATED MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE