This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:16:23 (UTC).

Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. OPDYKE GAS STATION INC et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Outlaw Laboratory, LP filed an Other lawsuit against OPDYKE GAS STATION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith, R. Steven Whalen and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-13381

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

Presiding Judges

Mark A. Goldsmith

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Outlaw Laboratory, LP

Defendants

NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC

HMA ENTERPRISES INC

Al-Hakim Corporation

KMA OIL INC

LENOX OIL INC

4661 GAS & MORE INC

YG & L CORP

OPDYKE GAS STATION INC

ORION FOOD STOP INC

SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher W. Boss

Attorney at Boss Law, PLLC

9887 4Th Street North, Suite 202

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

Defendant Attorneys

Mahde Y. Abdallah

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 West University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Troy C. Otto

Attorney at Fischer, Franklin,

500 Griswold, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3808

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure) (Otto, Troy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#23

(#23) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *ORION FOOD STOP INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#22

(#22) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *OPDYKE GAS STATION INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#21

(#21) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#20

(#20) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *KMA OIL INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#19

(#19) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *HMA ENTERPRISES INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#18

(#18) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Al-Hakim Corporation* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#17

(#17) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *4661 GAS & MORE INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. KMA OIL INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Al-Hakim Corporation served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 4661 GAS & MORE INC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATED ORDER Extending time for Defendant YG & L Corp to file a responsive pleading, ( Response due by 1/23/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mahde Y. Abdallah on behalf of YG & L CORP. (Abdallah, Mahde) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Outlaw Laboratory, LP against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7489020 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 18-12497, Judge Robert H. Cleland] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure) (Otto, Troy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *ORION FOOD STOP INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *OPDYKE GAS STATION INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *KMA OIL INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *HMA ENTERPRISES INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Al-Hakim Corporation* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *4661 GAS & MORE INC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 4661 GAS & MORE INC, Al-Hakim Corporation, HMA ENTERPRISES INC, KMA OIL INC, NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC, OPDYKE GAS STATION INC, ORION FOOD STOP INC by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ORION FOOD STOP INC served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. LENOX OIL INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. KMA OIL INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Al-Hakim Corporation served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 4661 GAS & MORE INC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATED ORDER Extending time for Defendant YG & L Corp to file a responsive pleading, ( Response due by 1/23/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mahde Y. Abdallah on behalf of YG & L CORP. (Abdallah, Mahde) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Outlaw Laboratory, LP against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7489020 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 18-12497, Judge Robert H. Cleland] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boss, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Outlaw Laboratory, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher W. E. Boss