This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 11:23:31 (UTC).

Outdoor One Communications LLC v. Scio, Township of

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Outdoor One Communications LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Scio, Township of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Hluchaniuk and Sean F. Cox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10708

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Outdoor One Communications LLC

Defendant

Scio, Township of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Richard Sheff, II

39555 Orchard Hill Place, Suite 600

Novi, MI 48375

Defendant Attorney

Thomas R. Meagher

Attorney at Foster, Swift,

313 S. Washington Square

Lansing, MI 48933-2193

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Scio, Township of. (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleadings by Scio, Township of (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Scio, Township of served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Meagher on behalf of Scio, Township of. (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Scio, Township of* (DAll) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7685773 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Scio, Township of. (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Outdoor One Communications LLC. (Responsive Pleading due by 5/11/2020) Entered by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleadings by Scio, Township of (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Scio, Township of served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Meagher on behalf of Scio, Township of. (Meagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Scio, Township of* (DAll) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7685773 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Sheff, Donald) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas R. Meagher