This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:48:45 (UTC).

OUELLETTE v. FRANCESCAS COLLECTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 OUELLETTE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FRANCESCAS COLLECTIONS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR OUELLETTE

Defendant

FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUY D. LORANGER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GUY D. LORANGER

1 Granny Smith Court, Suite 3

Old Orchard Beach, ME 04064

Defendant Attorneys

KATHARINE I. RAND

Attorney at PIERCE ATWOOD LLP

254 Commercial Street

Portland, ME 04101

MEGHAAN C. MADRIZ

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP

600 Travis St, Ste 7500

Houston, TX 77002-2906

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Administrative Closing Case By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Mitchell. (mlm) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Francesca's Collections, Inc.

#11

(#11) MOTION to Stay by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Francesca's Collections, Inc.)(RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by TAYLOR OUELLETTE. Reply due by 12/2/2020. (LORANGER, GUY) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#7

(#7) (Unsigned) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by TAYLOR OUELLETTE. Reply due by 12/1/2020. (LORANGER, GUY) Modified on 11/18/2020 to reflect document was not properly signed with /s/ signature block (mlm). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC Responses due by 11/17/2020. (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghaan C. Madriz filed by KATHARINE I. RAND on behalf of FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2347888.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

3 #3

summary sheet

3 #2

complaint

3 #1

docket rtecord

#3

(#3) STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 docket rtecord, #2 complaint, #3 summary sheet)(bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-20-277. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/19/2021) Fee due by 10/22/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Administrative Closing Case By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Mitchell. (mlm) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition for Francesca's Collections, Inc.)(RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by TAYLOR OUELLETTE. Reply due by 12/2/2020. (LORANGER, GUY) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 Response to Motion: Docket entry was modified to indicate that the attached document was not properly signed with a /s/ signature block. (mlm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (Unsigned) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by TAYLOR OUELLETTE. Reply due by 12/1/2020. (LORANGER, GUY) Modified on 11/18/2020 to reflect document was not properly signed with /s/ signature block (mlm). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO LOCAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, PHV Attorney Meghaan Madriz must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by November 5, 2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mlm) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC Responses due by 11/17/2020. (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Meghaan Madriz must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 10/30/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (meh) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghaan C. Madriz filed by KATHARINE I. RAND on behalf of FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2347888.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2347808.), filed by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC.(RAND, KATHARINE) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for FRANCESCAS COLLECTIONS, INC : Answer due by 10/27/2020. (bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 docket rtecord, #2 complaint, #3 summary sheet)(bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-20-277. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FRANCESCA'S COLLECTIONS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/19/2021) Fee due by 10/22/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less