This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2023 at 20:54:33 (UTC).

Camille Ouellette et al v. U.S. Department of State et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Camille Ouellette filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S Department of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01845

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMILLE OUELLETTE

KEVIN GIFFORD

Defendants

U.S. Department of State

U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary R. New

Scott A. Emerick

Defendant Attorneys

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Erin Choi

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#11

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) Order by Judge David O. Carter: Approving Stipulation of Dismissal #12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action, to include each claim and count asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendants, shall be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees, costs, and expenses. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order by Judge David O. Carter: Approving Stipulation of Dismissal #12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action, to include each claim and count asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendants, shall be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees, costs, and expenses. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants U.S. Consulate General Montreal, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Choi, Erin) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to U.S. Consulate General Montreal answer now due 1/11/2023; U.S. Department of State answer now due 1/11/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants U.S. Consulate General Montreal; U.S. Department of State.(Attorney Erin Choi added to party U.S. Consulate General Montreal(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Choi added to party U.S. Department of State(pty:dft))(Choi, Erin) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary R. New to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs KEVIN GIFFORD, CAMILLE OUELLETTE #5 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants U.S. Consulate General Montreal, U.S. Department of State, Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States, United States Attorney's Office. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary R. New to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs KEVIN GIFFORD, CAMILLE OUELLETTE (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34124130) filed by plaintiff KEVIN GIFFORD, CAMILLE OUELLETTE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Emerick, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying none known at this time. (Emerick, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs KEVIN GIFFORD, CAMILLE OUELLETTE. (Emerick, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff KEVIN GIFFORD, CAMILLE OUELLETTE. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Defedant Consulate, #2 Supplement Summons Atty. Gen., #3 Supplement Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Emerick, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34124086 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff CAMILLE OUELLETTE, KEVIN GIFFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NVC Case Creation, #2 Exhibit Immigrant Visa Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit Submission of DS5535) (Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party KEVIN GIFFORD(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party CAMILLE OUELLETTE(pty:pla))(Emerick, Scott) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less