This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 08:54:51 (UTC).

OUELLETTE et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 OUELLETTE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-13894

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEAN OUELLETTE

KAREN OUELLETTE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.

AVCO CORPORATION

BOEING COMPANY, THE

CARRIER CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION

CESSNA AIRCRAFT COMPANY

CRANE CO.

DAP, INC.

EATON AEROQUIP, INC.

EATON CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

FMC CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER NASH LLC

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

78 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM PAPAIN

Attorney at BELLUCK & FOX, LLP

546 Fifth Avenue 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

AUSTIN DAVID O'MALLEY

Attorney at MANNING GROSS AND MASSENBURG

14 Wall Street, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 07030

LINTON W. TURNER, JR.

Attorney at MAYFIELD, TURNER, O'MARA & DONNELLY

2201 Route 38, Suite 300

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

SARA KATHERINE SALTSMAN

Attorney at TURNER O'MARA DONNELLY & PETRYCKI PC

2201 Route 38, Suite 300

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

NANCY MCDONALD

Attorney at McELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY, ESQS.

1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

BRIAN JONATHAN SORENSEN

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP

1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

Other Attorneys

WILLIAM JOHN SMITH

Attorney at DICKIE, MC CAMEY & CHILCOTE, PC

20 Kings Highway West, Suite 200

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

TERENCE W. CAMP

Attorney at MARIN GOODMAN, LLP

500 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 102

Harrison, NY 10528

JOSEPH IRA FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

630 Third Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

AUDREY O ANYAELE

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

3 Second Street, Suite 202

Jersey City, NJ 07311

LEE HENIG-ELONA

Attorney at GORDON REES LLP

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

MATTHEW JAMES RICE

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L-3278-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jdb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#29

(#29) ORDER Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/04/2021. (jdb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#28

(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (TOMAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#27

(#27) STIPULATION to Remand by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#25

(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPIRAX SARCO, INC. identifying Sarco International Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of SPIRAX SARCO, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EATON CORPORATION identifying Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY MCDONALD on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TEXTRON, INC..(ANYAELE, AUDREY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOEING COMPANY, THE. (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by AUSTIN DAVID O'MALLEY on behalf of BOEING COMPANY, THE (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORP. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice to WILLIAM PAPAIN re mandatory eFiling. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION by Raytheon Technologies Corporation f/k/a United Technologies Corporation from Superior Court Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID L 3278 21 AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12646056), filed by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Middlesex County Courthouse*56 Paterson StreetNew Brunswick, NJ 08903 State No: MID-L-3278-21. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jdb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 08/04/2021. (jdb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY. (TOMAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION to Remand by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPIRAX SARCO, INC. identifying Sarco International Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of SPIRAX SARCO, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EATON CORPORATION identifying Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY MCDONALD on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE W. CAMP on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (CAMP, TERENCE) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEXTRON, INC.. (ANYAELE, AUDREY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TEXTRON, INC..(ANYAELE, AUDREY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOEING COMPANY, THE. (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by AUSTIN DAVID O'MALLEY on behalf of BOEING COMPANY, THE (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORP. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to WILLIAM PAPAIN re mandatory eFiling. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION by Raytheon Technologies Corporation f/k/a United Technologies Corporation from Superior Court Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID L 3278 21 AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12646056), filed by UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SMITH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, successor by merger to Eaton Aeroquip Inc., f/k/a Aeroquip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Cessna Aircraft Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant