This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 09:37:48 (UTC).

Otworth v. Whitmer

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Otworth filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Whitmer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00944

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarence Otworth

Twin Lake, MI 49457

Defendant

Gretchen Whitmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Neil Anthony Giovanatti

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Health/Education/Family Srvcs)

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs

Attorney at MI Dept of Attorney General (Health, Education & Family)

525 W Ottawa St., 3Rd Fl., P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #6

Exhibit E

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to response to motion #6 with certificate of service filed by Gretchen Whitmer (Husa Briggs, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (ems). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss and Brief in Support #6 filed by Clarence Otworth (jem) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for summary judgment by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (jem) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of docket sheet indicating default not entered #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (jem) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Gretchen Whitmer (jem) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Gretchen Whitmer (jem) Modified text on 11/5/2020; Motion to Dismiss #6 filed 10/30/2020 (jem). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Neil Anthony Giovanatti on behalf of defendant Gretchen Whitmer (Giovanatti, Neil) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to dismiss and Brief in Support with certificate of compliance and certificate of service by defendant Gretchen Whitmer; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Husa Briggs, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (jem). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Gretchen Whitmer served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020 (ems) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Gretchen Whitmer and returned to plaintiff via mail (ems) Modified text on 10/1/2020 (ems). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (ems) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to case 1:20-cv-405 (ems) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR072041; for civil filing fee (ems) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gretchen Whitmer filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ems) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Anthony Giovanatti