This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 07:03:08 (UTC).

Ottesen et al v. Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Ottesen filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07271

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allison Ottesen

Sean Allen

Lauren Accardi

Defendant

Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

L Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Scott Bursor

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

2665 S. Bayshore Drive, Suite 220

Miami, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

David Matthew Prager

Attorney at Epstein Becker Green, PC

1925 Century Park East, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin Dennis Sullivan

Attorney at Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.

1925 Century Park East, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Declaration David J. Marck, Esq.

16 #2

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jared Wheat, Other Affiliate Dave Nelson for Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Ottesen, Lauren Accardi, Sean Allen. Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Fisher, L) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

15 #2

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lauren Accardi, Allison Ottesen and Sean Allen. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#15

(#15) MOTION to Stay or, in the alternative, MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David J. Marck, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Prager, David) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David J. Marck, #2 Proposed Order)(Prager, David) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13854979.). Filed by Allison Ottesen, Lauren Accardi, Sean Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/4/2019) Modified on 11/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dennis Sullivan and David Matthew Prager (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

16 #1

Declaration David J. Marck

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David J. Marck, #2 Proposed Order)(Prager, David) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Stay or, in the alternative, MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/13/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David J. Marck, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Prager, David) (Filed on 12/30/2019) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • (#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lauren Accardi, Allison Ottesen and Sean Allen. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jared Wheat, Other Affiliate Dave Nelson for Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dennis Sullivan and David Matthew Prager (Sullivan, Kevin) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Ottesen, Lauren Accardi, Sean Allen. Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Fisher, L) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/4/2019) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13854979.). Filed by Allison Ottesen, Lauren Accardi, Sean Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/4/2019) Modified on 11/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.