This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 09:02:04 (UTC).

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Zenara Pharma Private Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zenara Pharma Private Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01269

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

H. Lundbeck A/S

Defendants

Zenara Pharma Private Ltd.

Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven J. Balick

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-G

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 8/19/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE,48,059 ;8,349,840 ;8,618,109 ;9,839,637 ;10,307,419. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H Lundbeck A/S. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd. for Zenara Pharma Private Ltd. filed by Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Seeking Consolidation of Actions, by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#10

(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (See D.I. 593 in lead case no. 19cv1938-LPS) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01599-LPS, 1:22-cv-01269-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:19-cv-01938-LPS. (ntl) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (588 in 1:19-cv-01938-LPS, 9 in 1:22-cv-01269-LPS) STIPULATED ORDER Seeking Consolidation of Actions filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/20/22. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01938-LPS, 1:22-cv-01269-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Seeking Consolidation of Actions, by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd. for Zenara Pharma Private Ltd. filed by Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (due to prior related cases). Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H Lundbeck A/S. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE,48,059 ;8,349,840 ;8,618,109 ;9,839,637 ;10,307,419. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 8/19/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3969147.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H Lundbeck A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less