This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:43:50 (UTC).

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01955

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

H. Lundbeck A/S

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven J. Balick

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H. Lundbeck A/S. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-G

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 9/9/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2755359.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,888,362 ;8,349,840 ;8,618,109 ;9,839,637 ;10,307,419. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01952-LPS through 1:19-cv-01956-LPS, 1:19-cv-01964-LPS, 1:19-cv-01965-LPS, 1:19-cv-01977-LPS, 1:19-cv-01987-LPS and 1:19-cv-01988-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • No Summons Issued. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H. Lundbeck A/S. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,888,362 ;8,349,840 ;8,618,109 ;9,839,637 ;10,307,419. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 9/9/2019. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2755359.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.