This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2020 at 09:23:38 (UTC).

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ajanta Pharma Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01335

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.

H. Lundbeck A/S

Defendant

Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven J. Balick

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald M. Daignault

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Juang

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang for Ajanta Pharma Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (10 in 1:20-cv-01335-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang filed by Ajanta Pharma Ltd., (10 in 1:20-cv-01332-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/5/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01332-LPS, 1:20-cv-01335-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault and Richard Juang - filed by Ajanta Pharma Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ajanta Pharma Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ajanta Pharma Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S : For Ajanta Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 10/8/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01332-LPS, 1:20-cv-01335-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H. Lundbeck A/S. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE48,059. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: August 21, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: April 12, 2026; pending Patent Term Extension request, when granted, extends to December 23, 2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Ajanta Pharma Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3237822.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ajanta Pharma USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Juang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis