This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2019 at 11:33:52 (UTC).

Otero et al v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 Otero filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00396

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zachary Johnson

Luis Otero

Defendant

Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David G Huffman-Gottschling

Attorney at Jacobs Burns Orlove & Hernandez

150 N Michigan Ave Ste 1000

Chicago, IL 60601

Charles P Burns

Attorney at Jacobs Burns Orlove & Hernandez

150 N Michigan Ave Ste 1000

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Louise Kandyba

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Chi/IL

55 W Monroe St Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60603-5001

Edward A DeVries

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Chi/IL

55 W Monroe St Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60603-5001

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/20/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/25/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #14 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT DE#13 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward) Modified on 11/8/2019 to reflect document is not a motion (tc). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#12 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#11 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burns, Charles) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David G Huffman-Gottschling on behalf of Zachary Johnson, Luis Otero (Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4034816.), filed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co..(Kandyba, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/20/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/25/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #14 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT DE#13 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/12/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer ddl reset to 12/6/2019. (tc) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.. (DeVries, Edward) Modified on 11/8/2019 to reflect document is not a motion (tc). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A DeVries on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (DeVries, Edward) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#12 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Louise Kandyba on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. (Kandyba, Mary) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#11 *** Modified on 11/12/2019 (ace). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burns, Charles) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachment: #1 Summons reflecting Northen District of Indiana - emailed to Attorney). (nal) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (nal) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David G Huffman-Gottschling on behalf of Zachary Johnson, Luis Otero (Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Co.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4034816.), filed by Luis Otero, Zachary Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Huffman-Gottschling, David) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less