This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:49 (UTC).

Oswald et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Oswald against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17036

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal

ROBERT OSWALD

STEPHEN ROSENTHAL

Mary Beth Kerns

Defendants

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC

LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS

In Re

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#14

(#14) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

No Description Available

#13

(#13) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

13 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#3

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted from PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#5

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#1

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-cv-05302 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION(gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted from PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda P. Nussbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Linda P. Nussbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Oswald; Mary Beth Kerns; Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal; Stephen Rosenthal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc.; Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda) Modified on 6/6/2019 (sj). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17025923)Document filed by Stephen Rosenthal, Robert Oswald, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal, Mary Beth Kerns.(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.