Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 07:16:17 (UTC).

Ostrow v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Ostrow filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln Benefit Life Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01928

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheryl Ostrow

Defendant

Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Reese Bronsnick

Attorney at Mandelbaum Salsburg P.C.

3 Becker Farm Road

Rosedale, NJ 07468

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cheryl Ostrow. Lincoln Benefit Life Company waiver sent on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Declaration Andrew R. Bronsnick, Esq.

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Dunn, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14504414. by Cheryl Ostrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew R. Bronsnick, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service) (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Cheryl Ostrow (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14359751 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Cheryl Ostrow. (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cheryl Ostrow. Lincoln Benefit Life Company waiver sent on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Dunn, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14504414. by Cheryl Ostrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew R. Bronsnick, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service) (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Cheryl Ostrow (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket***FINAL NOTICE:*** Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 page form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 page form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14359751 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Cheryl Ostrow. (Bronsnick, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant