This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 09:08:46 (UTC).

Ostendorf v. Navient Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Ostendorf filed an Other lawsuit against Navient Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah L. Boardman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00550

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah L. Boardman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason A Ostendorf

Baltimore, MD 21117

Defendant

Navient Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason A Ostendorf

Attorney at Law Office of Jason Ostendorf LLC

One Corporate Center, 10451 Mill Run Circle Ste 400

Baltimore, MD 21117

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Marc Kaplan

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

2000 K Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Eric M Hurwitz

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young LLP

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 100

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Remand Letter sent to District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County(c/m 4/5/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#17

(#17) Consent Correspondence re: Remanding Case (Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

15 #1

Attachment Comparison Copy

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) ORDER re: Discovery Dispute Protocol. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/21/2022. (c/m 3/21/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Scheduling Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Hurwitz on behalf of Navient Solutions, LLC (Hurwitz, Eric) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Navient Solutions, LLC.(Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (c/m 3/9/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Removal by Navient Solutions, LLC (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued 60 days as to Navient Solutions, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Compliant

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Remand Letter sent to District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County(c/m 4/5/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER approving consent request to remand this case #17 and directing the Clerk to remand the case to the District Court of Maryland for BaltimoreCounty and to close this case. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/5/2022. (lmys, Chambers) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent Correspondence re: Remanding Case (Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket(#16) PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling the conference call for Wednesday, April 6, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 4/4/2022. (lmys, Chambers) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Navient Solutions, LLC, filed by Jason A Ostendorf. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Comparison Copy)(Ostendorf, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re: Discovery Dispute Protocol. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/21/2022. (c/m 3/21/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Scheduling a Conference Call for Wednesday, April 6, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(c/m 3/21/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Hurwitz on behalf of Navient Solutions, LLC (Hurwitz, Eric) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Navient Solutions, LLC.(Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Navient Solutions, LLC (Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correspondence sent to Jason A Ostendorf re: Removal Notification. (c/m 3/9/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) -[FILED IN ERROR]- Correspondence sent to Jason A Ostendorf re: Removal Notification. (c/m 3/9/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/9/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (c/m 3/9/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Removal by Navient Solutions, LLC (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 60 days as to Navient Solutions, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Navient Solutions, LLC, filed by Jason A Ostendorf.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Correspondence re: (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number D-08-CV-22-007558. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9804335), filed by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Compliant, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Kaplan, Adam) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navient Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam M Kaplan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric M. Hurwitz Esq.