This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2020 at 07:07:14 (UTC).

Osorio v. Hol-Mac Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Osorio filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Hol-Mac Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayra Osorio

Defendants

Hol-Mac Corporation

Quality Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Alain Viadro

Attorney at Butler Viadro, LLP

414 13Th Street, 7Th Floor, Oakland

San Francisco, CA 94612

David Olivares Peralta, II

Attorney at Butler Viadro LLP

414 13Th Street 7Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

Jack Christopher Henning

Attorney at Dillingham & Murphy, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cynthia C. Cheung

Attorney at Dillingham Murphy LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bernice K. Wu

Attorney at Dillingham & Murphy LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand Action to State Court filed byMayra Osorio. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit A-D

#15

(#15) Declaration of Jack C. Henning in Support of #14 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#14

(#14) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hol-Mac Corporation.. (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#11

(#11) Declaration of Christopher A. Viadro in Support of Motion to Remand filed byMayra Osorio. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by Mayra Osorio. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hol-Mac Corporation Proof of Service of ADR and Magistrate Forms (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mayra Osorio.. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hol-Mac Corporation Proof of Personal Service of Removal Pleadings (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hol-Mac Corporation Certificate of Interested Parties (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit G-I

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit F

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A-E

#3

(#3) Declaration of Jack C. Henning In Support of Defendant and Cross-Complainant Hol-Mac Corporation's Notice of Removal filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit Exhibit G-I)(Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County. Their case number is MSC-19-01600. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14060667) filed by Hol-Mac Corporation (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand Action to State Court filed byMayra Osorio. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Declaration of Jack C. Henning in Support of #14 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hol-Mac Corporation.. (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of Christopher A. Viadro in Support of Motion to Remand filed byMayra Osorio. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by Mayra Osorio. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hol-Mac Corporation Proof of Service of ADR and Magistrate Forms (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mayra Osorio.. (Viadro, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hol-Mac Corporation Proof of Personal Service of Removal Pleadings (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byHol-Mac Corporation. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hol-Mac Corporation Certificate of Interested Parties (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Jack C. Henning In Support of Defendant and Cross-Complainant Hol-Mac Corporation's Notice of Removal filed byHol-Mac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit Exhibit G-I)(Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County. Their case number is MSC-19-01600. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14060667) filed by Hol-Mac Corporation (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET. Filed by Hol-Mac Corporation. (Henning, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Christopher Henning