This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 07:19:55 (UTC).

Osmun, et al v. Abbott Laboratories, et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Osmun filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02007

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Klaire Osmun

Joshua Osmun

Joshua Osmum

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Abbott Laboratories Inc.

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diane Watkins

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Dave P Matthews

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2500 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

Jeffrey Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell Llp

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Yvette Diaz

Attorney at Freese & Goss, PLLC

3500 Maple Avenue, Ste 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLp

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Tim K. Goss

Attorney at Freese & Goss PLLC

3031 Allen Street, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorney

Skyler D Davenport

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Joshua Osmun, Individually, Klaire Osmun, as Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor, Klaire Osmun, Individually, Joshua Osmun, as Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7850177. Service due by 6/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/17/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/17/2022)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) Motion to allow David P. Matthews to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865973) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#4

(#4) Motion to allow Tim K. Gross to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865982) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#5

(#5) Motion to allow Yvette Diaz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865991) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Attorney Skyler D Davenport added to party Mead Johnson & Company, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Skyler D Davenport added to party Mead Johnson Nutrition Company(pty:dft))(Davenport, Skyler) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED NOTICE of appearance by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Davenport, Skyler) Modified on 4/14/2022 clarifying docket text (Siegert, Karen). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Davenport, Skyler) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #3

Exhibit 3

#11

(#11) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL No. 3026. Signed on 4/19/2022. Case electronically transferred. (Keller, Jeanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/19/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RECEIVED from Missouri Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-05018 (nsf) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL No. 3026. Signed on 4/19/2022. Case electronically transferred. (Keller, Jeanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer Mead Johnson & Company, LLC answer due 5/13/2022; Mead Johnson Nutrition Company answer due 5/13/2022. Signed on April 14, 2022 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Accardi, Max) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Davenport, Skyler) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED NOTICE of appearance by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Davenport, Skyler) Modified on 4/14/2022 clarifying docket text (Siegert, Karen). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Attorney Skyler D Davenport added to party Mead Johnson & Company, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Skyler D Davenport added to party Mead Johnson Nutrition Company(pty:dft))(Davenport, Skyler) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 , #4 , and #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David P. Matthews, Tim K. Goss and Yvette Diaz for all plaintiffs allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to allow Yvette Diaz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865991) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to allow Tim K. Gross to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865982) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow David P. Matthews to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7865973) filed by Diane Watkins on behalf of Joshua Osmum, Joshua Osmun, Klaire Osmun(Individually), Klaire Osmun(As Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor). (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC., Mead Johnson Nutrition Company filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Joshua Osmun, Individually, Klaire Osmun, as Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor, Klaire Osmun, Individually, Joshua Osmun, as Parent and General Guardian of N.O., a minor. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7850177. Service due by 6/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 4/21/2022.] (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant