This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:17:58 (UTC).

O'Shea v. Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 O'Shea filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Sandra O'Shea

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.

Singer Safety Company

Whittier Filtration, Inc.

Fisher Controls International, LLC

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

Grinnell Corporation

Weil McLain Company

RCH Newco II, LLC

Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd.

Goodin Company

Zurn Industries, LLC

General Engineering Development Corporation

Industrial Holdings Corporation

Cleaver Brooks

Rite-Hite Corporation

Bell & Gossett

Burnham, LLC

Hobart Brothers Company

Frommelt Safety Products

Sandra O'Shea

92 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, PC

802 1St Avenue North

Fargo, ND 58102

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jason Mohr

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Kyle B. Mansfield

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

1200 Marquette Plaza, 250 Marquette Ave

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Paul Rudell Oppegard

Attorney at Oppegard Law Firm

2901 South Frontage Road, Po Box 657

Moorhead, MN 56561

Jack E. Zuger

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Patrick T. Tierney

Attorney at Collins, Buckley, Sauntry & Haugh PLLP

West 1100 First National Bank Building, 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-1379

Joanna M. Salmen

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

250 Marquette Ave., Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jon P. Parrington

Attorney at Pustorino & Parrington, PLLC

Ste. 190, 6800 France Ave. So.

Minneapolis, MN 55435-2013

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

David T. Schach

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Heather H. Neubauer

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John C. Hughes

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jon R Russell

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P. (MN)

33 South Sixth Street, Suite 4400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeanette Boechler

Attorney at Boechler, PC

802 1St Avenue North

Fargo, ND 58102

Other Attorneys

Cassandra A. Marka

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

Jane L. Dynes

Attorney at Serkland Law Firm, P.C.

10 Roberts St., P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Joel A. Flom

Attorney at Flom Law Office, P.A.

1703 32Nd Avenue South

Fargo, ND 58103

Brent J. Edison

Attorney at Vogel Law Firm (Fargo)

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

Scott J. Landa

Attorney at Zimney Foster PC

3100 S Columbia Rd, Suite 200

Grand Forks, ND 58201

Thomas D. Jensen

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson PA

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Ave S

Minneapolis, MN 55402

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#68

#67

#66

#63

#62

#61

#60

#59

1 #43

Exhibit 43 - Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Reque

1 #42

Exhibit 42 - Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogator

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Bismarck Tribune article "Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids"

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Bismarck Tribune article "Kiewit Bids Low at Minot"

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Bismarck Tribune article "To Break Ground For Base at Minot&qu

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Minot Air Force Base History

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Terrence O'Shea

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Work History of Terrence O'Shea

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint

#1

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2019. Added Attorney Thomas M. Stieber for defendants Cleaver Brooks, Goodin Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, RCH Newco II, LLC, Rite-Hite Corporation, Singer Safety Company, Weil McLain Company, and for Zurn Industries, LLC. (DR #190820-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 6/29/2020. Discovery Motions due by 7/15/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/18/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/29/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/10/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 10/27/2019. Amend Pleadings due by 10/27/2019. Amend Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 10/27/2019. Nondispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Threshold Motions due by 9/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2020. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (trial est. 10-13 days) (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into Chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Burnham, LLC (Mugaas, Emily) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Mugaas, Emily) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Mugaas on behalf of Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC (Mugaas, Emily) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra A. Marka on behalf of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc. (Marka, Cassandra) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Landa on behalf of Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc. (Landa, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Leighton on behalf of Walker Jamar Company (Leighton, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerks office added Corporate Parent: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (js) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. for Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Wells, Roland) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add Corporate Parent - NEF Regenerated. (js) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Wells, Roland) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AWT Air Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Aqua Alliance Inc., Other Affiliate Research-Cottrell for AWT Air Company, Inc... (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodin Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (as) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Heather H. Neubauer by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Assignment and Case Number, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant Research-Cottrell, Inc., N/K/A AWT Air Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant Western Steel & Plumbing's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Defendant Owens-Illinois Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Defendant McMaster-Carr Supply Company's Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Defendant H.B. Fuller Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #8 Exhibit H - Defendant Smith-Sharpe Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Defendant Goodin Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 Exhibit J - Defendant RCH Newco II, LLC, f/k/a Robertson Ceco Corporation an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #11 Exhibit K - Defendant Northern Plumbing Supply, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #12 Exhibit L - Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #13 Exhibit M - Grinnell Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 Exhibit N - Defendant Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #15 Exhibit O - Defendant Singer Safety Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #16 Exhibit P - Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #17 Exhibit Q - Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC'Ss Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #18 Exhibit R - Defendant CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, F/K/A Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, F/K/A Westinghouse Electric Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #19 Exhibit S - Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint and Notice of Appearance of Jack Auger, #20 Exhibit T - Defendant Goodrich Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #21 Exhibit U - Defendant General Engineering Development Corporation f/k/a Fuel Economy Engineering Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #22 Exhibit V - Defendant Fargo Moorhead Insulation Company's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint and Affidavit of Jon P. Parrington Certifying Correct Identity of Manufacturer of Product, #23 Exhibit W - Defendant Marley-Wylain Company's (incorrectly Named as Weil McLain Company) Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #24 Exhibit X - Defendant Hobart Brothers LLC, Formerly Hobart Brothers Company's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #25 Exhibit Y - Defendant Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.'s Answer and Demand for Trial by Jury to Plaintiff Complaint, #26 Exhibit Z - Defendant Union Carbide Corporation Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #27 Exhibit AA - Defendant ITT Corporation/Bell & Gossett's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #28 Exhibit BB - Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #29 Exhibit CC - Defendant Bayer CropScience, Inc.' s Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #30 Exhibit DD - Defendant Praxair Distribution, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #31 Exhibit EE - Defendant Rite-Hite Company, LLC f/k/a Rite-Hite Corporation And Ductsox Corporation f/k/a Frommelt Safety Products, A Subsidiary Of Rite-Hite Company, LLC' s Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #32 Exhibit FF - Defendant Honeywell, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #33 Exhibit GG - Defendant Sprinkmann Sons Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #34 Exhibit HH - Defendant Foster Products Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #35 Exhibit II - Defendant Burnham LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #36 Exhibit JJ - Defendant Baker Manufacturing Company, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #37 Exhibit KK - Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s, Answer to Plaintiff Complaint)(as) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2019-cv-1798. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000381 filed by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Work History of Terrence O'Shea, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Terrence O'Shea, #4 Exhibit 4 - Minot Air Force Base History, #5 Exhibit 5 - Bismarck Tribune article "To Break Ground For Base at Minot", #6 Exhibit 6 - Bismarck Tribune article "Kiewit Bids Low at Minot", #7 Exhibit 7 - Bismarck Tribune article "Iowa Firm Low on Minot Bids", #8 Exhibit 8 - Bismarck Tribune article "Minot Air Base Gets More Funds", #9 Exhibit 9 - Bismarck Tribune Article "Minot Air Base Bid Opening Set", #10 Exhibit 10 - Public Law 534 301, #11 Exhibit 11 - Public Law 765 301, #12 Exhibit 12 - Public Law 85-685, #13 Exhibit 13 - Public Law 87-554, #14 Exhibit 14 - Bismarck Tribune article "Minot Area Will Have ICBM Sites", #15 Exhibit 15 - Bismarck Tribune article "Minuteman Aide is Assigned, #16 Exhibit 16 - Bismarck Tribune article First Minuteman Property Bought from Kief Couple, #17 Exhibit 17 - Bismarck Tribune article "67 Million Low on Missile Work, #18 Exhibit 18 - The Impact of the Safeguard Antiballistic Missile System Construction on Northeastern North Dakota, #19 Exhibit 19 - Perimeter Acquisition Radar Attack Characterization System, #20 Exhibit 20 - SMDC History: Construction to begin on RSLs, #21 Exhibit 21 - SMDC History: Army Accepts Safeguard System, #22 Exhibit 22 - Cavalier Air Force Station: Instant to Watchful Instant, #23 Exhibit 23 - SMDC History: The Armys newest post, #24 Exhibit 24 - Minot Air Force Base, Minot, North Dakota, Specifications for SAC Missile Facility, Invitation Serial No. Eng. 25-066-59-140, #25 Exhibit 25 - Deposition of William Sornsin, 6/30/1987, #26 Exhibit 26 - Deposition of William Sornsin, 9/28/1983, #27 Exhibit 27 - Deposition of Herbert Gartner, 8/21/1991, #28 Exhibit 28 - Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr., 1/18/1983, #29 Exhibit 29 - Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr. 12-05-1991, #30 Exhibit 30 - Deposition of J. Nodsle, 1/25/1983, #31 Exhibit 31 - Deposition of James Matthews, 3/23/1982, #32 Exhibit 32 - Deposition of James Matthews, 3/24/1982, #33 Exhibit 33 - Deposition of Rudolph Opp, 10/15/1991, #34 Exhibit 34 - Deposition of Rudolph Opp, 7/18/1994, #35 Exhibit 35 - Deposition of Bruce Bergson, 7/18/2000, #36 Exhibit 36 - Deposition of Andrew I. Olerud, Jr. dated February 21, 1991, #37 Exhibit 37 - Declaration of Kyle Dotson, #38 Exhibit 38 - MilSpec-C-28610, #39 Exhibit 39 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage, MIL-STD-129C, #40 Exhibit 40 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage, MIL-STD-129C Change Notice 1, #41 Exhibit 41 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage, MIL-STD-129C Change Notice 3, #42 Exhibit 42 - Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #43 Exhibit 43 - Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #44 Exhibit 44 - Deposition of Noralf Tweit, 4/6/1982, #45 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Singer Safety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Whittier Filtration, Inc. is a litigant