This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 19:01:58 (UTC).

O'Shaughnessy v. Young Living Essential Oils, LC et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 O'Shaughnessy filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Young Living Essential Oils, LC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00470

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie O'Shaughnessy

Defendants

Jared Turner

Benjamin Riley

Mary Young

The Young Living Foundation, Inc.

Young Living Essential Oils, LC

Young Living Essential Oils, LC doing business as Young Living Essential Oils

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Von Maack

Attorney at MCNEILL VON MAACK

175 S Main St Ste 1050

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

J. David Rowe

Attorney at DUBOIS BRYANT & CAMPBELL LLP

303 Colorado St Ste 2300

Austin, TX 78701

Jason A. McNeill

Attorney at MCNEILL VON MAACK

175 S Main St Ste 1050

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Robert E. Linkin

Attorney at MUNCK WILSON MANDALA LLP

2801 Via Fortuna Dr Ste 630

Austin, TX 78746

Austin Patrick Tighe

Attorney at NIX PATTERSON

3600 N Capital Of Texas Hwy B350

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan S. Johansen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

John T. Sullivan

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

David C. Reymann

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeffrey J. Hunt

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

John C.C. Sanders, Jr

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert S. Clark

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Katrina G. Eash

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Mary T. McCarthy

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

35 W Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60601

Thomas M. Melsheimer

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

2121 N Pearl St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#114

#113

#112

111 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Austin Tighe

111 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Austin Tighe

#111

#110

107 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. David Rowe

#98

7 #1

Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

225 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER granting #111 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Austin Tighe for Julie O'Shaughnessy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/17/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #98 MOTION to Dismiss - FRCP 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/10/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Austin Tighe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3672836,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Austin Tighe, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Austin Tighe)(Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER granting #107 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney J. David Rowe for Julie O'Shaughnessy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/4/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ORDER granting #106 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert E. Linkin for Julie O'Shaughnessy.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/4/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days after the court issues its ruling on Defendant(s)' motion(s) to dismiss. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/4/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. David Rowe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3669921,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. David Rowe, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of J. David Rowe)(Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Linkin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3669888,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert E. Linkin, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert E. Linkin)(Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. McNeill on behalf of Julie O'Shaughnessy (McNeill, Jason) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Joinder in Young Living Essential Oil LC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Young Living Foundation, Inc.. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C.C. Sanders, Jr on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Benjamin Riley(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party The Young Living Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Jared Turner(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Mary Young(pty:dft), Attorney John C.C. Sanders, Jr added to party Young Living Essential Oils, LC(pty:dft) (Sanders, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of Katrina G. Eash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12216516) by on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Melsheimer on behalf of Benjamin Riley, The Young Living Foundation, Inc., Jared Turner, Mary Young, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Benjamin Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party The Young Living Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Jared Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Mary Young(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer added to party Young Living Essential Oils, LC(pty:dft) (Melsheimer, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11995032). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Julie O'Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rowe, J.) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/30/2020.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNG LIVING ESSENTIAL OILS, L.C,, doing business as Young Living Essential Oils is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Von Maack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Eric Linkin