This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 07:38:50 (UTC).

Osburn et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Osburn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Evelyn J. Furse, Clark Waddoups and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

Presiding Judges

Evelyn J. Furse

Clark Waddoups

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra Osburn

Raymond Osburn

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Troy Cullimore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael K. McKell

Attorney at MCKELL CHRISTIANSEN WISE PLLC

642 Kirby Ln Ste 105

Spanish Fork, UT 84660

Brittany L. Thompson

Attorney at MCKELL CHRISTIANSEN WISE PLLC

642 Kirby Ln Ste 105

Spanish Fork, UT 84660

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Belnap

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Chet W. Neilson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Andrew D. Wright

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

9350 S 150 E Ste 820

Sandy, UT 84070

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the current deadline for the parties to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule (ECF No. 6) is extended until twenty-one (21) days after the Court has ruled on Defendants Objection to the Amended Complaint and Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Reject the Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. Section 1447(e) (ECF No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/25/2019. (las) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Non-Opposition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support (Neilson, Chet) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Exh A - Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order)(Thompson, Brittany) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

12 #5

Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing)

12 #4

Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)

12 #3

Exhibit C (Amended Complaint)

12 #2

Exhibit B (Answer)

12 #1

Exhibit A (Complaint)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Regarding Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing))(Neilson, Chet) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

10 #5

Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing)

10 #4

Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)

10 #3

Exhibit C (Amended Complaint)

10 #2

Exhibit B (Answer and Jury Demand)

10 #1

Exhibit A (Complaint)

#4

(#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn, Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Form due by 3/21/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wright, Andrew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • (#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/9/2019. (ncw) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • (#17) The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting in part #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the current deadline for the parties to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule (ECF No. 6) is extended until twenty-one (21) days after the Court has ruled on Defendants Objection to the Amended Complaint and Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Reject the Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. Section 1447(e) (ECF No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/25/2019. (las) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Non-Opposition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support (Neilson, Chet) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order)(Thompson, Brittany) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Regarding Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing))(Neilson, Chet) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 Objections. The document appears to be a Motion. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as such. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (las) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) OBJECTIONS to #8 Amended Complaint and Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Reject the Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer and Jury Demand), #3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Case No. 170904537 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Exhibit E (Case No. 2:18-cv-316 Transcript of October 11, 2018 Motion Hearing))(Neilson, Chet) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) File Received from Fourth District Court -Provo, Utah County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A) (las) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. New Defendants: Troy Cullimore. filed by Sandra Osburn, Raymond Osburn. (Thompson, Brittany) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#7) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (las) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/6/2019. (las) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Belnap, Paul) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn, Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Form due by 3/21/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Raymond Osburn, Sandra Osburn, and Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (tlh) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District Court of Utah County, case number 190400248, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3218579) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Belnap, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.