This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 07:14:48 (UTC).

Osborne v. Physicians Immediate Care LLC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Osborne filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Physicians Immediate Care LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Harry D. Leinenweber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05764

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry D. Leinenweber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Osborne

Defendant

Physicians Immediate Care LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Dunn

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Peter F. Ferracuti

110 E. Main Street

Ottawa, IL 61350

Defendant Attorney

Scott A. Calkins

Attorney at Reno & Zahm LLP

2902 Mcfarland Road, Suite 400

Rockford, IL 61107

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff Osborne shall respond to Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC's Motion to Dismiss by 11/5/2020 #6 ; Physicians Immediate Care LLC may reply by 11/12/2020. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A-E

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM by Physicians Immediate Care LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record (pj, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC -Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC by Scott A. Calkins (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Will County, case number (2020-L-664) filed by Physicians Immediate Care LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17482378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint))(Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff Osborne shall respond to Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC's Motion to Dismiss by 11/5/2020 #6 ; Physicians Immediate Care LLC may reply by 11/12/2020. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM by Physicians Immediate Care LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record (pj, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC -Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Physicians Immediate Care LLC by Scott A. Calkins (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Will County, case number (2020-L-664) filed by Physicians Immediate Care LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17482378. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint))(Calkins, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Dunn