This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2022 at 08:12:39 (UTC).

Osborne v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Osborne filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Campbell Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Osborne

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria Rizkalla Gerguis

Attorney at Daly & Black, PC - Houston

2211 Norfolk St, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Richard D Daly

Attorney at Daly & Black, PC - Houston

2211 Norfolk St, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Max A. Moran

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

Sara Elizabeth Inman

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

Sherman Vance Wittie

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

Susan Elizabeth Egeland

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 9/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. The scheduling conference set for 6/7/2022 is canceled. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 6/3/2022. (ndc) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 6/2/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/5/2022. (ndc) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Richard Osborne Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons (Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard Osborne. (Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max A. Moran on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moran, Max) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Inman on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Inman, Sara) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#3

(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sherman Vance Wittie on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Wittie, Sherman) Modified on 4/27/2022 (wea, ). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 9/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 306 (Tyler) before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. The scheduling conference set for 6/7/2022 is canceled. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 6/3/2022. (ndc) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 6/2/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 5/5/2022. (ndc) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Richard Osborne Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons (Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard Osborne. (Gerguis, Maria) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (wea, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (wea, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max A. Moran on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Moran, Max) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Inman on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Inman, Sara) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sherman Vance Wittie on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Wittie, Sherman) Modified on 4/27/2022 (wea, ). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Egeland, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from CC2 Gregg County, case number 2022-399-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8880745), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Egeland, Susan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #8 Exhibit C - CORRECTED) (wea, ). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer S. Vance Wittie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan E Egeland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E. Inman