This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 16:42:42 (UTC).

Osborn v. The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Osborn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer L. Thurston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00842

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Thurston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gordon R. Osborn

Defendant

The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Brian Horrow

Attorney at Donahue & Horrow LLP

1960 E. Grand Ave., Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Scott E. Calvert

Attorney at Donahue & Horrow

1960 E. Grand Ave., Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel W. Maguire

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen T. Tsui

Attorney at Burke, Williams and Sorensen, LLP

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/09/2021.New Case Number: 1:21-cv-00842-JLT. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Gordon R. Osborn re #2 Civil New Case Documents,. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

2 #5

VDRP

2 #4

Consent Form

2 #3

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

2 #2

Standing Order

2 #1

Worksheet

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

1 #4

Notice of No Related Cases

1 #3

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Bakersfield Superior Court, case number BCV-21-100909 by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9620725) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Notice of No Related Cases)(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company.(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/09/2021.New Case Number: 1:21-cv-00842-JLT. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Gordon R. Osborn re #2 Civil New Case Documents,. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Bakersfield Superior Court, case number BCV-21-100909 by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9620725) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Notice of No Related Cases)(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen T. Tsui