This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:51 (UTC).

Ortiz v. Von Blanckensee

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ortiz filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Von Blanckensee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Bury and Lynnette C Kimmins (PS). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Bury

Referral Judge

Lynnette C Kimmins (PS)

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carlos Ortiz

Tucson, AZ 85734

Respondent

Barbara Von Blanckensee

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carlos Ortiz. (3 pages) (DLC) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDERED that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply with this ORDER, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Review ORDER for details. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 1/15/2020. (MCO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Carlos Ortiz. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KEP) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carlos Ortiz. (3 pages) (DLC) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDERED that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply with this ORDER, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Review ORDER for details. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 1/15/2020. (MCO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KEP) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Carlos Ortiz. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KEP) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less