This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:21:28 (UTC).

Ortiz v. Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Ortiz filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie R. Hoffman and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01644

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Elena Ortiz

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC

Timothy Loguidice

Timothy Blakeslee

Joseph Loguidice

Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC doing business as Pin Ups of Daytona Beach

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Cathleen Ann Scott

Attorney at Scott Wagner & Associates, PA

250 S Central Blvd Ste 104-A

Jupiter, FL 33458-8812

Ved Chitale

Attorney at Kennedy Hodges, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77006

David W. Hodges

Attorney at Kennedy Hodges, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd, Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Gary S. Edinger

Attorney at Benjamin, Aaronson, Edinger & Patanzo, P.A.

305 N.E. 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. Related case(s): No (Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#26

(#26) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 FLSA scheduling order, #10 Interested persons order by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER: Defendants are DIRECTED to file both a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's orders (Docs. #9, #10). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#23

(#23) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file for Leave to File Reply Brief by Elena Ortiz. (Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/16/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION for David W. Hodges to appear pro hac vice by Elena Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#19

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order - Santiero - Case No.: 3:17-cv-01233-HLA (M.D. Fla.), #2 Exhibit Santiero Counterclaim and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/13/2019)

#13

(#26) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 FLSA scheduling order, #10 Interested persons order by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#10

(#25) ORDER: Defendants are DIRECTED to file both a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's orders (Docs. #9, #10). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Gabriel A. Assaad, appearing on behalf of Elena Ortiz (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL085338.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to appear pro hac vice. (JP) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (BIA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15837070) filed by Elena Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Scott, Cathleen) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BIA). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Remark: Doc. #26 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/18/19. (EBU) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. Related case(s): No (Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 FLSA scheduling order, #10 Interested persons order by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/reset deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims . Replies due by 10/24/2019. (BIA) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: Defendants are DIRECTED to file both a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's orders (Docs. #9, #10). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Plaintiff may file a reply not to exceed five (5) pages on or before Thursday, October 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (MT) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Unopposed MOTION for leave to file for Leave to File Reply Brief by Elena Ortiz. (Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/16/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for David W. Hodges to appear pro hac vice by Elena Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order - Santiero - Case No.: 3:17-cv-01233-HLA (M.D. Fla.), #2 Exhibit Santiero Counterclaim and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Edinger, Gary) (Entered: 10/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/12/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/11/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to appear pro hac vice by Elena Ortiz. (Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Gabriel A. Assaad, appearing on behalf of Elena Ortiz (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL085338.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to appear pro hac vice. (JP) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/6/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Gabriel A. Assaad to appear pro hac vice by Elena Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Cathleen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued as to Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC. (BIA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE to counsel Gabriel A. Assaad of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk)(copies mailed). (BIA) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-1644-Orl-37LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Timothy Blakeslee, Joseph Loguidice, Pin Ups of Daytona Beach, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15837070) filed by Elena Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Scott, Cathleen) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BIA). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less