This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:34:46 (UTC).

Ortiz v. ABC Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Ortiz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABC Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02582

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Ortiz

Defendants

ABC CORP

DEF CORP

Marriott International, Inc.

JKL CORP

GHI CORP

John Does 1-7

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Burmeister

Attorney at Ross & Pines, LLC

Suite 4355555 Glenridge Connector

Atlanta, GA 30342

Peter Edwin Bennion

Attorney at Ross & Pines, LLC

5555 Glenridge Connectorsuite 435

Atlanta, GA 30342

Peter Jonathan Ross

Attorney at Ross & Pines, LLC

Suite 4355555 Glenridge Connector

Atlanta, GA 30342

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Wylly Killorin, III

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

191 Peachtree Street Nesuite 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Paul Barry Trainor

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Brief in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of Defendant marriott International, Inc. ONLY. (jkb) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by William Ortiz. (Burmeister, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Settlement by William Ortiz (Burmeister, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 12, 2021. (ash) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Marriott International, Inc. Discovery ends on 11/22/2021. (ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT ON 06/25/21)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11067555) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JKL, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant