This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2019 at 07:30:28 (UTC).

Ortiz v. Inguran, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Ortiz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Inguran, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02282

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Ortiz

Defendant

Inguran, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George K Farah

Attorney at Farah Law Group PLLC

1211 Hyde Park Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Nathan Eugene Inurria

Attorney at Guerra and Farah PLLC

1211 Hyde Park Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Brian Glenn Patterson

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP

1111 Louisiana, 44Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Inguran, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to file its answer or otherwise respond is extended to August 19, 2019.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Inguran, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to file its answer or otherwise respond is extended to August 5, 2019.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Inguran, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Inguran, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Inguran, LLC, filed.(Inurria, Nathan) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Inguran, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22677594) filed by Angel Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Inurria, Nathan) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less