This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:48:53 (UTC).

Ortiz et al v. Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Ortiz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01972

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANUEL ORTIZ

A.R.O Minor

DIANA ORTIZ

Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Ortiz

A.R.O.

Defendants

Universal Insurance Company

Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park

Oro Verde, Inc.

Company XYZ

Oroverde Corp.

Dr. John Doe

Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe

Insurance Company ABC

Toro Verde Corp.

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at CJ Legal Services PSC

Po Box 70250, Suite 279

San Juan, PR 00936

Defendant Attorney

Jose J. Lamas-Rivera

Attorney at Andreu & Sagardia Law Office

261 Ave. Domenech

San Juan, PR 00918

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for extension of time to TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT**** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#5

(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Universal Insurance Company served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6637238.), filed by MANUEL ORTIZ, A.R.O Minor, DIANA ORTIZ. Service due by 1/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for extension of time to TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/18/2019. (lir) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD, #5 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR. As per filer's request. Wrong name of party in PDF*** (gmm) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT**** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Universal Insurance Company served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6637238.), filed by MANUEL ORTIZ, A.R.O Minor, DIANA ORTIZ. Service due by 1/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.